Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas House Bill HR173

Caption

Recognizing February 27, 2019, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

Impact

The resolution serves to promote Pearland on a state level, affirming its significance within Texas and fostering community pride. By marking this day, the Texas Legislature acknowledges the contributions of Pearland's residents and its history, aiming to strengthen ties between state government and local constituents. Recognition at the State Capitol can aid in attracting future investments and tourism, as it elevates the community's profile in the eyes of both lawmakers and residents alike.

Summary

House Resolution 173 recognizes February 27, 2019, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol, commemorating the city's growth and development over 125 years. Originally named Mark Belt in 1893, Pearland transformed from a small community affected by natural disasters into one of the fastest-growing suburbs near Houston. The resolution highlights the city's unique character, attractions, and its dedication to economic development through local partnerships, especially with educational institutions.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding HR173 is largely positive, celebrating local achievements and fostering a sense of identity and pride among Pearland's residents. The resolution underscores the collaboration between local government, businesses, and educational institutions, casting Pearland as a thriving and dynamic community. Supporters view this recognition as an affirmation of hard work and a beacon for continued collaboration and growth.

Contention

While the resolution is primarily celebratory and lacks significant controversy, there may be underlying discussions regarding the nature of state recognition for local communities. As with other local celebrations acknowledged by the Legislature, it can evoke conversations about the allocation of state resources and attention, though HR173 itself stands as a unifying acknowledgment rather than a divisive legislative action.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

TX HR177

Recognizing February 25, 2015, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR614

Recognizing February 27, 2013, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR333

Recognizing February 22, 2017, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR224

Recognizing February 22, 2023, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR1440

Celebrating the Pearland Adult Reading Center's 10th Annual Red Hat Literacy Luncheon.

TX SR213

Recognizing February 22, 2023, as Pearland Day.

TX HR555

Recognizing February 23, 2011, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR123

Recognizing February 27, 2019, as Pearland Day.