Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR123

Caption

Recognizing February 27, 2019, as Pearland Day.

Impact

The resolution serves not only to commemorate Pearland's history but also to promote its ongoing development and community spirit. By declaring a day to celebrate Pearland, the state legislature acknowledges its status as one of the fastest-growing areas in Texas, which has seen substantial changes and development over the past 125 years. This recognition can enhance local pride and foster a sense of belonging among residents, while also attracting potential visitors and investors interested in the area's growth.

Summary

Senate Resolution No. 123, adopted by the Texas Senate on February 27, 2019, recognizes February 27 as Pearland Day at the State Capitol. This resolution honors the residents of Pearland, a city with a rich history dating back to its establishment in 1893. The resolution highlights significant events in Pearland's past, including its developments in agriculture and the impact of the Galveston hurricane, as well as the discovery of oil and gas that catalyzed its growth in the years to follow.

Contention

While Senate Resolution No. 123 is not a contentious piece of legislation, it reflects the state's appreciation for local communities and their unique identities. There are often broader discussions surrounding local versus state recognition and support for municipal development, but in this case, the resolution does not focus on divisive issues. Instead, it emphasizes unity, celebration of local achievements, and the positive narrative surrounding Pearland's growth and contributions to the state of Texas.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HR173

Recognizing February 27, 2019, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

Similar Bills

TX SR213

Recognizing February 22, 2023, as Pearland Day.

TX HR224

Recognizing February 22, 2023, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR173

Recognizing February 27, 2019, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR375

Recognizing February 26, 2025, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR2150

In memory of Thomas Patton Alexander, Sr., of Pearland.

TX HR555

Recognizing February 23, 2011, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR177

Recognizing February 25, 2015, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR614

Recognizing February 27, 2013, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.