Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR213

Caption

Recognizing February 22, 2023, as Pearland Day.

Impact

The adoption of SR213 serves primarily as an honorary recognition rather than altering or impacting existing state laws. It contributes to fostering a sense of community and local pride, indirectly reinforcing the role of local municipalities within the state framework. Resolutions like SR213 are often annual traditions in legislative sessions to honor various communities and can enhance local visibility in state politics.

Summary

Senate Resolution 213 (SR213), introduced by Senator Middleton, recognizes February 22, 2023, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol. The resolution highlights the significance of Pearland as a community in Texas, celebrating its contributions and achievements. The motion passed in a committee discussion, emphasizing unity and pride in local communities within the broader context of state governance.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding SR213 appears to be positive, reflecting a shared appreciation among legislators for Pearland's contributions. The recognition day is celebrated positively by both local officials and broader community members, acting as a platform to showcase Pearland’s culture and identity in the larger Texas landscape.

Contention

There were no notable points of contention discussed during the committee meetings regarding SR213. The nature of such resolutions usually leads to broad consensus, and as trained, it was primarily welcomed without significant opposition or debate. The focus remained on recognition rather than contentious legislative alterations.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

TX HR224

Recognizing February 22, 2023, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR173

Recognizing February 27, 2019, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR123

Recognizing February 27, 2019, as Pearland Day.

TX HR375

Recognizing February 26, 2025, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR2150

In memory of Thomas Patton Alexander, Sr., of Pearland.

TX HR177

Recognizing February 25, 2015, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR614

Recognizing February 27, 2013, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR555

Recognizing February 23, 2011, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.