Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HR2150

Introduced
5/20/11  
Refer
5/23/11  
Enrolled
5/30/11  

Caption

In memory of Thomas Patton Alexander, Sr., of Pearland.

Impact

The resolution not only serves to honor Thomas Patton Alexander's memory but also reflects on the broader significance of local leadership in fostering community development. It illustrates how individual commitment to public service can resonate throughout a town, underscoring the vital role local leaders play in shaping community identity and well-being. By acknowledging Alexander's lifetime of contributions, the resolution reinforces the values of civic engagement and dedication to community betterment.

Summary

HR2150 is a resolution that pays tribute to the memory of Thomas Patton Alexander, Sr., a distinguished community leader from Pearland, Texas. The resolution commemorates his contributions to the community, recognizing his roles in local governance, including his membership on the Pearland City Council, and his involvement in various local organizations such as the Pearland Volunteer Fire Department and the Pearland Chamber of Commerce. The resolution highlights his dedication to civic duties, illustrating the impact that Alexander had on the Pearland community over the years he served.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding HR2150 is overwhelmingly positive, as it celebrates a life dedicated to public service. Community members and local leaders likely view this tribute as a rightful acknowledgment of Alexander's legacy, which may inspire future generations to engage in community service and local governance. The resolution not only remembers Alexander as a person but also creates a narrative that ties together values of commitment, service, and community pride.

Contention

While HR2150 stands as a unified voice of appreciation for Thomas Patton Alexander's contributions, there is an undertone concerning the challenges local communities often face in preserving strong leadership. The resolution opens up discussions about ongoing support for local governance and highlights that the legacy of community leaders is critical for continual progress. However, there may also be quieter voices within the community that question how to best maintain such legacies in a changing socio-political landscape, marking an area for potential future dialogue.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

TX SR213

Recognizing February 22, 2023, as Pearland Day.

TX HR224

Recognizing February 22, 2023, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR173

Recognizing February 27, 2019, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

TX SR123

Recognizing February 27, 2019, as Pearland Day.

TX HR375

Recognizing February 26, 2025, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR177

Recognizing February 25, 2015, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR614

Recognizing February 27, 2013, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.

TX HR555

Recognizing February 23, 2011, as Pearland Day at the State Capitol.