House
|
07/01/2022
|
Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
|
|
|
House
|
07/01/2022
|
Vetoed by Governor (G)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Delivered to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by President Pro Tem (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
Signed by House Speaker (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2022
|
House Message (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2022
|
Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 106 NOES: 31 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2022
|
House Adopts (H) - SS AYES: 107 NOES: 28 PRESENT: 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2022
|
Taken Up
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Reported to the House with... (H) - SS
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 30 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
SS Adopted (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
SS Offered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2022
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, March 8, 2022, SCR 1, 10:30 a.m. or upon recess, whichever is later.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Second read and referred: General Laws(S)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 137 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 5
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Referred: General Laws(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2021
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|