Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB1667 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note June 2, 2022
Fiscal Note April 26, 2022
Fiscal Note February 1, 2022
Fiscal Note January 7, 2022
Bill December 1, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 1, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 13, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis May 13, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 21, 2022
Analysis December 3, 2021

Substitute

Bill April 25, 2022