Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2289 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 30, 2022
Fiscal Note February 7, 2022
Fiscal Note January 23, 2022
Bill January 6, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 30, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 1, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Bill February 7, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022