LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Missouri MO
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2287
Draft Versions
MO
Missouri House Bill HB2287
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Missouri 2024 Regular Session
Missouri House Bill HB2287
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
May 15, 2024
Fiscal Note
April 17, 2024
Fiscal Note
March 5, 2024
Fiscal Note
January 21, 2024
Bill
January 4, 2024
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 4, 2024
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
April 18, 2024
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
April 23, 2024
Analysis
March 6, 2024
Analysis
February 8, 2024
Analysis
January 19, 2024
Substitute
Bill
April 17, 2024
Compare