Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 8 2025 7:46AM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/09/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 9 2025 3:21PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs: May 14 2025 12:07AM
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 6 2025 9:36PM
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 6 2025 7:04PM
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 6 2025 8:56PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs: May 14 2025 9:51PM
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 6 2025 9:38PM
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 15 2025 9:46PM
Last Action: 05/13/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/13/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/13/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/13/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/15/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 05/13/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 14 2025 8:10PM
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 15 2025 4:50PM
Last Action: 05/13/2025 E Filed with the Secretary of State
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Received from the Senate
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 05/13/2025 E Sent to the Governor