Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate 2011 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR13

Introduced
2/3/11  
Introduced
2/3/11  
Enrolled
2/17/11  
Enrolled
2/17/11  
Passed
3/2/11  
Congratulating the Hardin-Simmons University women's soccer team on winning a national championship title.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR14

Introduced
2/3/11  
Affirming the pride of all Texans in both our one and indivisible national union and our one and indivisible state, claiming sovereignty under the Tenth Amendment to the Constitution of the United States over all powers not otherwise enumerated and granted to the federal government by the U.S. Constitution, serving notice to the federal government to cease and desist from certain mandates, and providing that certain federal legislation be prohibited or repealed.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR15

Introduced
2/9/11  
Introduced
2/9/11  
Enrolled
2/14/11  
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 9, 2011, and ending on Monday, February 14, 2011.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR16

Introduced
2/11/11  
Introduced
2/11/11  
Refer
2/17/11  
Refer
2/17/11  
Report Pass
3/16/11  
Report Pass
3/16/11  
Refer
4/29/11  
Refer
4/29/11  
Report Pass
5/12/11  
Report Pass
5/12/11  
Enrolled
5/23/11  
Enrolled
5/23/11  
Passed
6/17/11  
Designating the month of March each year from 2011 through 2020 as Women Veterans Month in tribute to the immeasurable contributions that women in the military have made to this nation.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR17

Introduced
2/17/11  
Introduced
2/17/11  
Enrolled
2/28/11  
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, February 17, 2011, and ending on Tuesday, February 22, 2011.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR18

Introduced
2/22/11  
Introduced
2/22/11  
Refer
3/1/11  
Refer
3/1/11  
Report Pass
3/16/11  
Report Pass
3/16/11  
Refer
4/29/11  
Refer
4/29/11  
Report Pass
5/12/11  
Report Pass
5/12/11  
Enrolled
5/20/11  
Enrolled
5/20/11  
Passed
6/17/11  
Designating a portion of the city of Gonzales as the official Texas History Museum District.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR19

Introduced
2/22/11  
Introduced
2/22/11  
Enrolled
3/2/11  
Enrolled
3/2/11  
Passed
3/18/11  
Commending the doctors, educators, and parents who participate in the Reach Out and Read program.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR2

Introduced
11/10/10  
Introduced
11/10/10  
Refer
2/2/11  
Refer
2/2/11  
Report Pass
3/24/11  
Report Pass
3/24/11  
Refer
4/29/11  
Refer
4/29/11  
Report Pass
5/12/11  
Report Pass
5/12/11  
Enrolled
5/25/11  
Enrolled
5/25/11  
Passed
6/17/11  
Urging Congress to reauthorize the Water Resources Development Act of 2007, Section 5056, and to appropriate sufficient funds so that efforts to solve the salt problem in the Amistad International Reservoir can continue.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR20

Introduced
2/23/11  
Introduced
2/23/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Refer
2/28/11  
Report Pass
3/23/11  
Urging the United States Congress to prevent the Environmental Protection Agency from regulating greenhouse gases for stationary sources.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR21

Introduced
2/23/11  
Introduced
2/23/11  
Enrolled
2/28/11  
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 23, 2011, and ending on Monday, February 28, 2011.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR22

Introduced
2/23/11  
Introduced
2/23/11  
Enrolled
3/2/11  
Enrolled
3/2/11  
Passed
3/18/11  
Recognizing February 28, 2011, as Texas Southern University Day at the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR23

Introduced
3/2/11  
Introduced
3/2/11  
Enrolled
3/7/11  
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 2, 2011, and ending on Monday, March 7, 2011.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR24

Introduced
3/9/11  
Introduced
3/9/11  
Enrolled
3/14/11  
Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 9, 2011, and ending on Monday, March 14, 2011.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR25

Introduced
3/9/11  
Introduced
3/9/11  
Refer
3/16/11  
Refer
3/16/11  
Report Pass
4/26/11  
Report Pass
4/26/11  
Refer
5/2/11  
Refer
5/2/11  
Enrolled
5/17/11  
Enrolled
5/17/11  
Passed
5/28/11  
Expressing continued support for the construction of a monument on Capitol grounds recognizing Texans who served in the Vietnam War.
TX

Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR26

Introduced
3/10/11  
Introduced
3/10/11  
Refer
3/16/11  
Urging Congress to ensure that Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program benefits are adequate for the purchase of a healthy diet.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records