Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HJR135 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/10/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/11/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/11/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/08/2023 E Filed with the Secretary of State
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/19/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/20/2023 10:00 am
HB8
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/11/2023 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/07/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 S Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/19/2023 S No action taken in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/11/2023 S Received from the House