Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2476 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/19/2023
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/21/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/21/2023 S Received from the House
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 05/19/2023 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 05/19/2023 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/15/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Introduced
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Signed by the Governor
05/09/2023 8:00 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E See remarks for effective date
04/12/2023 8:30 am
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/21/2023 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 21 2023 10:27AM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: May 6 2023 3:49PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Referred to Public Health: May 6 2023 3:49PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/18/2023 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Referred to Public Education: May 6 2023 3:49PM
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Referred to Public Health: May 4 2023 8:56PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/18/2023 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Referred to Public Health: May 6 2023 3:49PM