LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
Senate
Bills
SB930
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas Senate Bill SB930
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas Senate Bill SB930
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
05/17/2023
9:00 am
Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.016
SB1624
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB930
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
SB2248
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
SB2292
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
03/09/2023
9:00 am
State Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
Senate Chamber
SB930
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/17/2023 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
SB801
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB994
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB380
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective immediately
SB610
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
SJR52
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Postponed
SB643
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB922
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB896
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
SB718
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SJR54
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 03/30/2023 S Committee report printed and distributed: Mar 30 2023 12:19PM
SB932
Introduced
Last Action: 03/09/2023 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .