Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 29 2025 9:04PM
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S House passage as amended reported
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Energy Resources: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to s/c on Transportation Funding by Speaker: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 03/25/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 23 2025 3:17PM
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Signed in the House
Last Action: 04/16/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs