Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR468 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/01/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Human Services: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Insurance: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Public Health: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Public Health: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Environmental Regulation: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Human Services: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Higher Education: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Public Health: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Delivery of Government Efficiency: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Insurance: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Homeland Security, Public Safety & Veterans' Affairs: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Higher Education: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Introduced
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Human Services: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Human Services: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Transportation: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Transportation: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Delivery of Government Efficiency: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Corrections: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to s/c on Defense & Veterans' Affairs by Speaker : May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Elections: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Environmental Regulation: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Public Education: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Natural Resources: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Public Education: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Transportation: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Transportation: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Higher Education: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Public Education: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Signed in the House
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Signed in the House
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Placed on intent calendar