Texas 2025 - 89th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR501 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/06/2025
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Referred to s/c on Family & Fiduciary Relationships by Speaker: May 8 2025 11:58PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: May 8 2025 11:58PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs: May 7 2025 5:42PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Referred to Higher Education: May 8 2025 11:58PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/13/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Referred to Natural Resources: May 7 2025 5:42PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: May 8 2025 11:58PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Referred to Transportation: May 7 2025 5:42PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Referred to Transportation: May 7 2025 5:42PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Passed to 3rd reading
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: May 8 2025 11:58PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: May 8 2025 11:58PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: May 8 2025 11:58PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs: May 7 2025 5:42PM
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/13/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Referred to Human Services: May 8 2025 10:06AM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Referred to Elections: May 8 2025 11:58PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Referred to Public Health: May 8 2025 11:58PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Referred to Public Health: May 8 2025 11:58PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Referred to Land & Resource Management: May 10 2025 8:26PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Referred to Higher Education: May 10 2025 8:26PM
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Printed in full
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Reported enrolled
Introduced
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Printed in full
Introduced
Last Action: 05/08/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/13/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Referred to Finance
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce