Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB1269 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/22/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB7
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/26/2023 S House appoints conferees-reported
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on adoption of const. amendment
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/26/2023 S House appoints conferees-reported
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/30/2023 E Filed with the Secretary of State
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/22/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/22/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/22/2023 H Postponed
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/22/2023 H Postponed
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/22/2023 H Failed to pass to 3rd reading
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Postponed
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Postponed
05/22/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/14/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/26/2023 S House appoints conferees-reported
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB7
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/26/2023 S House appoints conferees-reported
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on adoption of const. amendment
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/26/2023 S House appoints conferees-reported
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/30/2023 E Filed with the Secretary of State
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Failed to pass
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/22/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/22/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/22/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/22/2023 H Postponed
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/22/2023 H Postponed
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/22/2023 H Failed to pass to 3rd reading
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Postponed
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Postponed
Introduced
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Reported enrolled: May 23 2023 9:44AM
Introduced
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Signed by the Governor
03/16/2023 9:30 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/06/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: May 6 2023 3:49PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/10/2023 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 10 2023 3:28PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 17 2023 1:42PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/22/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/29/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Committee report printed and distributed: Apr 12 2023 1:09PM