Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2010 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/18/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB3
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/26/2023 S House appoints conferees-reported
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/22/2023 E Filed with the Secretary of State
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/26/2023 S House appoints conferees-reported
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/18/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/16/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/26/2023 S House appoints conferees-reported
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
05/17/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Filed with the Secretary of State
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
05/17/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/15/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Signed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/19/2023 E Filed with the Secretary of State
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective immediately
03/23/2023 8:00 am
SB6
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 17 2023 1:42PM
SB7
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/26/2023 S House appoints conferees-reported
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/22/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 H Postponed
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/18/2023 H Left pending in committee
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 17 2023 1:42PM
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 17 2023 1:42PM