Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/07/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/14/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/07/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/12/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Passed
Last Action: 05/12/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Elections: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/07/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Passed to 3rd reading
Last Action: 05/10/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Printed in full
Last Action: 05/08/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Local & Consent Calendars: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 6 2025 8:00PM
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 8 2025 7:58PM
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/09/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/09/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 9 2025 3:21PM
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Senate passage reported
Last Action: 05/09/2025 H Senate passage reported