Last Action: 04/24/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S House passage as amended reported
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Additional sponsor(s) authorized
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S House passage as amended reported
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Co-sponsor authorized
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 1 2025 4:03PM
Last Action: 04/23/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Natural Resources
Last Action: 04/23/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Referred to Local Government