Louisiana 2019 Regular Session

Louisiana Senate Bill SR19

Introduced
4/10/19  

Caption

Designates Monday, April 15, 2019, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Capitol and commends ExxonMobil for one hundred ten years of partnership and progress with Louisiana.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Similar Bills

LA SR22

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 21, 2016, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Capitol.

LA SR24

Designates March 19, 2018, as ExxonMobil Day at the State Capitol and to commend ExxonMobil for its long-term contributions to the economy of the state of Louisiana.

LA SR27

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day.

LA HR28

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes April 17, 2017, as ExxonMobil Day at the Louisiana State Capitol

LA HR11

Designates March 19, 2018, as ExxonMobil Day at the legislature and commends ExxonMobil on their long-term contributions to the state of Louisiana

LA HR35

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 17, 2014, as ExxonMobil Day at the La. State Capitol

LA HR11

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, April 20, 2015, as ExxonMobil Day

LA HR5

Commends ExxonMobil and recognizes Monday, March 19, 2012, as ExxonMobil Day at the La. State Capitol