LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Missouri MO
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB2149
Draft Versions
MO
Missouri House Bill HB2149
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Missouri 2022 Regular Session
Missouri House Bill HB2149
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
June 2, 2022
Fiscal Note
May 5, 2022
Fiscal Note
May 3, 2022
Fiscal Note
April 13, 2022
Fiscal Note
February 8, 2022
Fiscal Note
January 10, 2022
Bill
January 4, 2022
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
February 8, 2022
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
May 11, 2022
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
May 12, 2022
Analysis
February 8, 2022
Analysis
January 25, 2022
Analysis
January 10, 2022
Conference Sub
Bill
May 4, 2022
Compare
Bill
May 3, 2022
Compare
Substitute
Bill
April 12, 2022
Compare