Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB133 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
05/26/2023
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 24 2023 4:18PM
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/26/2023 S Returned from the House for further action
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/26/2023 S House appoints conferees-reported
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/14/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/25/2023 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 25 2023 1:56PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/26/2023 S Returned from the House for further action
HB7
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/27/2023 H Senate appoints conferees-reported
HB5
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E See remarks for effective date
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/25/2023 H Senate Amendments Analysis distributed: May 25 2023 7:02PM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/26/2023 S House appoints conferees-reported
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/14/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB7
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/26/2023 S House appoints conferees-reported
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/26/2023 S House appoints conferees-reported
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on adoption of const. amendment
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/26/2023 S House appoints conferees-reported
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/30/2023 E Filed with the Secretary of State
03/08/2023 9:00 am
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/12/2023 H Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select: May 12 2023 12:02AM
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 03/08/2023 S Left pending in committee