Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S House passage as amended reported
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to State Affairs
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Local Government
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/06/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Health & Human Services
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Postponed
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Economic Development
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported engrossed: May 2 2025 2:18PM
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Vet Affairs
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Received from the House
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Laid on the table subject to call
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce