Last Action: 01/28/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Jan 28 2025 11:21AM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 S House passage as amended reported
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 2:52PM
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 03/13/2025 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 03/25/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Mar 25 2025 3:26PM
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 03/19/2025 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Energy Resources: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Passed
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/23/2025 E Effective on 9/1/25
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Insurance: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 03/20/2025 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 2:16PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/01/2025 E Sent to the Governor
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Passed
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 04/24/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Passed to 3rd reading
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/03/2025 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/25/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Elections: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 03/25/2025 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 03/26/2025 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to Elections: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Elections: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Recommitted to committee: May 2 2025 9:17AM
Last Action: 04/17/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 17 2025 2:29PM
Last Action: 03/17/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Mar 17 2025 3:28PM
Last Action: 04/22/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 22 2025 3:20PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Passed
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 03/18/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: Mar 18 2025 1:32PM
Last Action: 04/09/2025 H Referred to s/c on International Relations by Speaker: Apr 9 2025 11:27AM
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/09/2025 S Not again placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted