Last Action: 04/29/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 29 2025 9:04PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Elections: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Insurance: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/03/2025 E Effective on 9/1/25
Last Action: 05/08/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Vote taken in committee
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Left pending in committee
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Transportation
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Jurisprudence
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Business & Commerce
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Committee report printed and distributed: May 1 2025 4:03PM
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Criminal Justice
Last Action: 05/07/2025 S Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Finance
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Referred to Education K-16
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Delivery of Government Efficiency: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report distributed: May 2 2025 11:12AM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Insurance: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Education: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/30/2025 S Reported enrolled
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Higher Education: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Intergovernmental Affairs: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably as substituted
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Natural Resources: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Passed
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Passed
Last Action: 05/05/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Agriculture & Livestock: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Environmental Regulation: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Left pending in subcommittee
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/06/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Natural Resources: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/08/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/07/2025 H Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Higher Education: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to State Affairs: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Passed to 3rd reading
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Natural Resources: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Ways & Means: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Passed to 3rd reading
Last Action: 04/28/2025 H Referred to Transportation: Apr 28 2025 4:21PM
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Public Health: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Referred to Trade, Workforce & Economic Development: May 2 2025 2:03PM
Last Action: 05/05/2025 S Placed on intent calendar
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Referred to Human Services: Apr 30 2025 7:31PM
Last Action: 05/02/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Last Action: 04/30/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/29/2025 S Recommitted to committee
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Last Action: 05/01/2025 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Last Action: 04/24/2025 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Last Action: 05/01/2025 S Placed on intent calendar